AR HB1620 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Notification that HB1620 is now Act 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Arkansas Cycling Activities Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Arkansas Cycling Activities Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseNotification that HB1620 is now Act 573
2019-03-26HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-25HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-25HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-03-19HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-03-18HouseRe-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-18HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-18SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-13SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-13SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-12SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-07SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-07HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-06HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2019-03-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback