AR HB1619 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1619 is now Act 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Electric Motorized Scooter Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Electric Motorized Scooter Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseNotification that HB1619 is now Act 1015
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-10HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-10HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-10SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-10SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-09SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-04-08SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-08HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-05HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-05HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-05HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback