AR HB1616 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Notification that HB1616 is now Act 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Riverside Vocational Technical School Reappropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Riverside Vocational Technical School Reappropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08HouseNotification that HB1616 is now Act 415
2017-03-01HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-02-28HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-02-28HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-02-28SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2017-02-28SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2017-02-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-02-27SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2017-02-27SenateReceived from the House.
2017-02-24HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2017-02-24HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-24HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2017-02-24HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2017-02-23HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2017-02-21HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback