AR HB1610 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Relating To Public Meetings Under The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967.
Title
To Amend The Law Relating To Public Meetings Under The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Bentley [R] | Sen. John Payton [R] | Rep. Wade Andrews [R] | Rep. Rick Beck [R] |
Rep. Harlan Breaux [R] | Rep. Keith Brooks [R] | Rep. Karilyn Brown [R] | Rep. Matt Brown [R] |
Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] | Rep. Denise Ennett [D] | Rep. Lanny Fite [R] | Rep. Tony Furman [R] |
Rep. Delia Haak [R] | Rep. Wayne Long [R] | Rep. Mindy McAlindon [R] | Rep. Rick McClure [R] |
Rep. Richard McGrew [R] | Rep. Brit McKenzie [R] | Rep. Stephen Meeks [R] | Rep. David Ray [R] |
Rep. Marcus Richmond [R] | Rep. Ryan Rose [R] | Rep. Dwight Tosh [R] | Rep. Danny Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-30 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-03-13 | House | Filed |