AR HB1609 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Notification that HB1609 is now Act 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Notification that HB1609 is now Act 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code As They Relate To Teacher Licensure.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code As They Relate To Teacher Licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | House | Notification that HB1609 is now Act 732 |
2023-04-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-04-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-04-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-04-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-04-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2023-03-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-03-13 | House | Filed |