AR HB1608 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring The Study Of Adverse Childhood Experiences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring The Study Of Adverse Childhood Experiences.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2019-03-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-14HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-13HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback