AR HB1607 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Notification that HB1607 is now Act 724
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Notification that HB1607 is now Act 724
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Enforcement Of Laws Governing The Use Of Public Roads By All Terrain Vehicles; And To Permit Enforcement By Arkansas Wildlife Officers.
Title
Concerning The Enforcement Of Laws Governing The Use Of Public Roads By All Terrain Vehicles; And To Permit Enforcement By Arkansas Wildlife Officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 67 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 67 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Notification that HB1607 is now Act 724 |
2015-03-24 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-23 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-23 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Upon Sounding of the Ballot |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-12 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-03-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |