AR HB1604 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Notification that HB1604 is now Act 507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Notification that HB1604 is now Act 507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For The Examination And Regulation Of Certain Economic Development Finance Corporations By The State Bank Department; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Provide For The Examination And Regulation Of Certain Economic Development Finance Corporations By The State Bank Department; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Logan Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Notification that HB1604 is now Act 507 |
2017-03-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-28 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-24 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-02-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |