AR HB1600 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Notification that HB1600 is now Act 603
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Consider An Individual Who Earns A Teaching License Upon The Successful Completion Of An Alternative Educator Preparation Program An Eligible Applicant Under The State Teacher Education Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Consider An Individual Who Earns A Teaching License Upon The Successful Completion Of An Alternative Educator Preparation Program An Eligible Applicant Under The State Teacher Education Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseNotification that HB1600 is now Act 603
2019-03-27HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-26HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-26HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-26SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-07SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-07HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-06HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback