AR HB1596 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-25 - Notification that HB1596 is now Act 880
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-25 - Notification that HB1596 is now Act 880
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Sales For Resale To Apply To Items Sold For Use In Printing; And To Amend The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Certain Machinery And Equipment.
Title
To Allow The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Sales For Resale To Apply To Items Sold For Use In Printing; And To Amend The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Certain Machinery And Equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-25 | House | Notification that HB1596 is now Act 880 |
2021-04-21 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-20 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |