AR HB1594 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Notification that HB1594 is now Act 513
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Notification that HB1594 is now Act 513
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Laws Concerning Teaching Licenses.
Title
To Amend The Laws Concerning Teaching Licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Deann Vaught [R] | Sen. Lance Eads [R] | Rep. Megan Godfrey [D] | Rep. Delia Haak [R] |
Rep. Spencer Hawks [R] | Rep. Lee Johnson [R] | Rep. John Maddox [R] | Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Sen. James Sturch [R] | Sen. David Wallace [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Notification that HB1594 is now Act 513 |
2021-03-30 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-29 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2021-03-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |