AR HB1590 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Notification that HB1590 is now Act 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Title 3 Of The Arkansas Code Regarding Permits For Alcoholic Beverage Businesses; To Amend The Population Ratio For Permits To Sell Off-premises; And To Shorten The Time Period A Permit Is On Inactive Status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Title 3 Of The Arkansas Code Regarding Permits For Alcoholic Beverage Businesses; To Amend The Population Ratio For Permits To Sell Off-premises; And To Shorten The Time Period A Permit Is On Inactive Status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseNotification that HB1590 is now Act 571
2019-03-26HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-25HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-25HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-25SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-14SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback