AR HB1583 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Notification that HB1583 is now Act 569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Community Correction - County Jail Reimbursement Supplemental Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Community Correction - County Jail Reimbursement Supplemental Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseNotification that HB1583 is now Act 569
2019-03-26HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-25HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-25HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-25SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-03-25SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-19SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-19SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-19HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-03-19HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-03-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback