AR HB1582 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Notification that HB1582 is now Act 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas State Claims Commission Supplemental Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas State Claims Commission Supplemental Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseNotification that HB1582 is now Act 432
2019-03-08HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-07HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-07HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-07SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-07SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-06SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-06SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-06HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-03-06HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback