AR HB1582 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1582 is now Act 1343
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Arkansas Natural Gas Pipeline Safety Act Of 1971.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Arkansas Natural Gas Pipeline Safety Act Of 1971.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18HouseNotification that HB1582 is now Act 1343
2013-04-16HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-04-16HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-04-16HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2013-04-10HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2013-04-08HouseRe-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2013-04-08HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2013-04-06SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2013-04-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-06SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-05SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-05SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-03-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
2013-03-18SenateReceived from the House.
2013-03-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-03-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-03-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2013-03-01HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback