AR HB1581 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Implement A Survey Of Employee Engagement As An Assessment Tool To Be Used By All State Agencies.
Title
To Implement A Survey Of Employee Engagement As An Assessment Tool To Be Used By All State Agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - Motion to override veto on HB1581 Failed (Y: 42 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-03-21 | House | Motion to override veto on HB1581 Failed |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned from the Governor's office having been vetoed |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned from the Governor having been vetoed |
2017-03-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-13 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The vote by which HB 1581 failed of adoption was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |