AR HB1581 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that HB1581 is now Act 1157
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that HB1581 is now Act 1157
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Victims Of The Offense Of Human Trafficking; Concerning Posting A Notice Of The National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline; And To Provide For The Expungement Of Certain Criminal Convictions.
Title
Concerning Victims Of The Offense Of Human Trafficking; Concerning Posting A Notice Of The National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline; And To Provide For The Expungement Of Certain Criminal Convictions.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Leding [D] | Sen. Jason Rapert [R] | Rep. David Meeks [R] | Sen. Joyce Elliott [D] |
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Notification that HB1581 is now Act 1157 |
2013-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-04 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-20 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-01 | House | Filed |