AR HB1580 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Notification that HB1580 is now Act 516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Notification that HB1580 is now Act 516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Exempt Cosmetologists From Licensing Restrictions Based On Criminal Records.
Title
To Exempt Cosmetologists From Licensing Restrictions Based On Criminal Records.
Sponsors
Rep. Les Warren [R] | Sen. Justin Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Notification that HB1580 is now Act 516 |
2023-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-04-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-03-08 | House | Filed |