AR HB1580 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB1580 is now Act 1098
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016 To Provide For A Special Privilege Tax; To Levy A Special Privilege Tax On Medical Marijuana; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016 To Provide For A Special Privilege Tax; To Levy A Special Privilege Tax On Medical Marijuana; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10HouseNotification that HB1580 is now Act 1098
2017-04-03HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-04-03HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-04-03HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2017-03-31HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2017-03-29HouseRe-referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2017-03-29HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2017-03-29SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2017-03-29SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2017-03-29SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-28SenateThe vote by which HB 1580 FAILED was EXPUNGED.
2017-03-28SenateRead the third time and failed.
2017-03-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-21SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2017-03-21SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-21SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-03-21SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-03-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2017-03-02SenateReceived from the House.
2017-03-02HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2017-03-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2017-02-17HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback