AR HB1578 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Notification that HB1578 is now Act 1086
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Notification that HB1578 is now Act 1086
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal And Replace The Woman's Right To Know Act Of 2001; And To Provide For Voluntary And Informed Consent For An Abortion.
Title
To Repeal And Replace The Woman's Right To Know Act Of 2001; And To Provide For Voluntary And Informed Consent For An Abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | House | Notification that HB1578 is now Act 1086 |
2015-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-30 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-23 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |