AR HB1576 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Notification that HB1576 is now Act 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Institutions Of Higher Education Capital Improvement Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Institutions Of Higher Education Capital Improvement Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08HouseNotification that HB1576 is now Act 403
2019-03-07HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-06HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-06HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-06SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-06SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-05SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-05HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-05HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-03-05HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-02-28HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback