AR HB1575 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB1575 is now Act 1105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB1575 is now Act 1105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Limit The Amount Of Fund Balances A School District May Maintain.
Title
To Limit The Amount Of Fund Balances A School District May Maintain.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lowery [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 52 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Motion to reconsider HB1575 by Rep. Maddox Passed (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 49 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - EXPUNGED (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 52 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Motion to reconsider HB1575 by Rep. Maddox Passed (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 49 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - EXPUNGED (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Notification that HB1575 is now Act 1105 |
2017-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-31 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The vote by which HB 1575 FAILED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-27 | House | Motion to reconsider HB1575 by Rep. Maddox Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-20 | House | The vote by which HB1575 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2017-03-20 | House | Motion by Rep. Lowery to expunge the vote on HB1575 Passed |
2017-03-20 | House | EXPUNGED |
2017-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-16 | House | Filed |