AR HB1572 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that HB1572 is now Act 560
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Informed Consent For Chemical Abortion Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Informed Consent For Chemical Abortion Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HouseNotification that HB1572 is now Act 560
2021-03-31HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-03-30HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-03-30HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-03-30SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-03-30SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-17SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-17SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-16HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-15HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-02-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback