AR HB1570 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide Statutory Guidance Concerning Interstate Conventions Under The United States Constitution, Article V.
Title
To Provide Statutory Guidance Concerning Interstate Conventions Under The United States Constitution, Article V.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 29 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-03-09 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-16 | House | Filed |