AR HB1567 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that HB1567 is now Act 839
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Investigations Into Sexual Assault; Concerning Sexual Assault Collection Kits; And Concerning The Submission Of Sexual Assault Collection Kits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Investigations Into Sexual Assault; Concerning Sexual Assault Collection Kits; And Concerning The Submission Of Sexual Assault Collection Kits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseNotification that HB1567 is now Act 839
2019-04-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-05HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-04SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-12SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-06HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback