AR HB1565 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Notification that HB1565 is now Act 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Notification that HB1565 is now Act 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide Funding For A National Cancer Institute-designated Cancer Center In The State Through Changes In The Laws Relating To The Sale And Taxation Of Tobacco Products, Cigarette Paper, And E-cigarettes.
Title
To Provide Funding For A National Cancer Institute-designated Cancer Center In The State Through Changes In The Laws Relating To The Sale And Taxation Of Tobacco Products, Cigarette Paper, And E-cigarettes.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 74 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Sounding of the Ballot (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 67 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Sounding of the Ballot (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 67 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Notification that HB1565 is now Act 580 |
2019-03-26 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-25 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-25 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The vote by which HB1565 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which HB1565 failed. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Sounding of the Ballot |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-05 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-05 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |