AR HB1556 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Locations Where Handguns May Be Prohibited; Concerning Age Requirements To Possess A Handgun; And To Repeal Laws In Conflict.
Title
Concerning The Locations Where Handguns May Be Prohibited; Concerning Age Requirements To Possess A Handgun; And To Repeal Laws In Conflict.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Womack [R] | Sen. Scott Flippo [R] | Rep. Justin Gonzales [R] | Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R] |
Rep. Brandt Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |