AR HB1555 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Notification that HB1555 is now Act 959
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Notification that HB1555 is now Act 959
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Increase Coverage For Medications Approved By The United States Food And Drug Administration For Tobacco Cessation In The Arkansas Medicaid Program.
Title
To Increase Coverage For Medications Approved By The United States Food And Drug Administration For Tobacco Cessation In The Arkansas Medicaid Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Notification that HB1555 is now Act 959 |
2019-04-09 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-19 | House | Motion by Representative Capp to reconsider HB1555 vote passed |
2019-03-18 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |