AR HB1553 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Earn And Learn Act Of 2021; And To Allow Individuals To Work And Earn A Paycheck While Also Fulfilling Licensing Requirements And Gaining The Skills To Fill The Needs Of An Expanding Workforce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Earn And Learn Act Of 2021; And To Allow Individuals To Work And Earn A Paycheck While Also Fulfilling Licensing Requirements And Gaining The Skills To Fill The Needs Of An Expanding Workforce.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-18HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-15HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-09HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-09HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-09HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-02-24HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback