AR HB1553 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Notification that HB1553 is now Act 601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The National Day Of The Cowboy In Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The National Day Of The Cowboy In Arkansas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseNotification that HB1553 is now Act 601
2019-03-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-27HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-27HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-27SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-14SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-07HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-07HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-07HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback