AR HB1547 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Notification that HB1547 is now Act 958
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Notification that HB1547 is now Act 958
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Ensure That Persons Licensed To Provide Emergency Medical Services Or Advanced Life Support Rescue Services Maintain Continual National Emergency Medical Services Certification.
Title
To Ensure That Persons Licensed To Provide Emergency Medical Services Or Advanced Life Support Rescue Services Maintain Continual National Emergency Medical Services Certification.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Notification that HB1547 is now Act 958 |
2019-04-09 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-02-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |