AR HB1546 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Notification that HB1546 is now Act 339
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Notification that HB1546 is now Act 339
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Regarding Individuals With Disabilities; And To Recognize And Protect Organizations Holding Certificates Issued Under Section 14(c) Of The Fair Labor Standards Act.
Title
To Amend The Law Regarding Individuals With Disabilities; And To Recognize And Protect Organizations Holding Certificates Issued Under Section 14(c) Of The Fair Labor Standards Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Notification that HB1546 is now Act 339 |
2023-03-17 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-03-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |