AR HB1546 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Notification that HB1546 is now Act 395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Book Report Of The Secretary Of State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Book Report Of The Secretary Of State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08HouseNotification that HB1546 is now Act 395
2017-03-02HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-01HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-01HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-03-01SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2017-03-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-02-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-02-21SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-02-21SenateReceived from the House.
2017-02-21HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-17HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-15HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-02-14HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback