AR HB1546 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - House Notification that HB1546 is now Act 1205
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Specify The Colors Of The State Flag And Require That It Be Made In The United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Specify The Colors Of The State Flag And Require That It Be Made In The United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-04 House Notification that HB1546 is now Act 1205
2011-04-04 House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2011-04-01 House TO BE ENROLLED
2011-04-01 House Returned From the Senate as passed.
2011-04-01 Senate Returned to the House as passed.
2011-04-01 Senate Read the third time and passed.
2011-03-30 Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2011-03-01 Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2011-03-01 Senate Received from the House.
2011-03-01 House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2011-02-28 House Returned by the Committee Do Pass
2011-02-24 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2011-02-24 House Filed

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback