AR HB1543 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1543 is now Act 823
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require The Assessment Coordination Division To Issue Certain Annual Reports; And To Prohibit New Or Updated Assessment Guidelines From Becoming Effective Until They Have Been Reported To Legislative Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require The Assessment Coordination Division To Issue Certain Annual Reports; And To Prohibit New Or Updated Assessment Guidelines From Becoming Effective Until They Have Been Reported To Legislative Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21HouseNotification that HB1543 is now Act 823
2021-04-20HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-19HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-19HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2021-04-15HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2021-04-13HouseRe-referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2021-04-13HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-04-13SenateReturned to the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1.
2021-04-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-12SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-08SenateRe-referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2021-04-08SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-08SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-04-08SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-03-17SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2021-03-17SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-16HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-15HouseRe-referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2021-03-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-15HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1543&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1543/HB1543022320211340.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1543/HB1543031520211354.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1543/HB1543040820211011.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=823.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1543-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1543-S1.pdf
Supplementftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/FiscalImpact/2021R/Public/HB1543-DFA1.pdf
Supplementftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/FiscalImpact/2021R/Public/HB1543-DFA2.pdf
Supplementftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/FiscalImpact/2021R/Public/HB1543-DFA3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1543&rcs=2385&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1543&rcs=2743&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1543&rcs=2910&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback