AR HB1543 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Notification that HB1543 is now Act 636
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Notification that HB1543 is now Act 636
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Mergers Of Technical Institutes And Community Colleges; To Specify The Process For A Possible Merger Of Crowley's Ridge Technical Institute To East Arkansas Community College; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
Concerning Mergers Of Technical Institutes And Community Colleges; To Specify The Process For A Possible Merger Of Crowley's Ridge Technical Institute To East Arkansas Community College; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Motion to re-refer HB 1543 to Senate Committee on Education, FAILED. (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Motion to re-refer HB 1543 to Senate Committee on Education, FAILED. (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Notification that HB1543 is now Act 636 |
2017-03-21 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-20 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Motion to re-refer HB 1543 to Senate Committee on Education, FAILED. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-06 | House | Emergency Clause Failed of Adoption |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-06 | House | Motion to Reconsider HB1543 Passed |
2017-03-02 | House | Rep. Watson, D served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which HB1543 Failed to Pass - 03/02/2017 01:59:26 PM |
2017-03-01 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-27 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-24 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-24 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |