AR HB1538 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Landlord And Tenant Law; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Protection Of Victims Of Domestic Abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Landlord And Tenant Law; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Protection Of Victims Of Domestic Abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Expunge the Vote (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-04SenateMotion to Suspend the Rules Failed
2019-04-04SenateMotion to Suspend the Rules to Place at the End of the Calendar
2019-04-04SenateThe vote by which HB1538 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-04-04SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote
2019-04-04SenateRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-26SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback