AR HB1534 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify The Procedures For Obtaining Or Transferring A Permit For A Private Club.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify The Procedures For Obtaining Or Transferring A Permit For A Private Club.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 30 N: 39 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 45 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-03-12HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-03-11HouseThe vote by which HB1534 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-03-11HouseMotion by Representative Wardlaw to expunge vote on HB1534 passed
2019-03-11HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-03-07HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-07HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-07HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-06HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback