AR HB1533 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Notification that HB1533 is now Act 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Possession Of A Weapon At A Residential Treatment Facility Owned Or Operated By The Division Of Youth Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Possession Of A Weapon At A Residential Treatment Facility Owned Or Operated By The Division Of Youth Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseNotification that HB1533 is now Act 431
2019-03-08HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-07HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-07HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-07SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-26SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback