AR HB1527 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Notification that HB1527 is now Act 496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Notification that HB1527 is now Act 496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Continuing Education Requirements For Real Estate Licensees.
Title
Concerning Continuing Education Requirements For Real Estate Licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Notification that HB1527 is now Act 496 |
2017-03-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-17 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2017-02-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |