AR HB1525 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1525 is now Act 1062
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1525 is now Act 1062
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Unlawful Possession, Transportation, And Use Of Medical Marijuana.
Title
Concerning The Unlawful Possession, Transportation, And Use Of Medical Marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Notification that HB1525 is now Act 1062 |
2021-04-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2021-04-22 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed, as amended, Amendment #1 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Re-referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 4 |
2021-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-09 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |