AR HB1521 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Notification that HB1521 is now Act 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Codify Executive Orders 20-18 And 20-34 To Ensure Healthcare Professionals Are Equipped With The Tools Necessary To Combat Covid-19; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Codify Executive Orders 20-18 And 20-34 To Ensure Healthcare Professionals Are Equipped With The Tools Necessary To Combat Covid-19; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseNotification that HB1521 is now Act 510
2021-03-30HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-03-29HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-03-29HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2021-03-23HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2021-03-12HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-11HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-03-11SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2021-03-11SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-03-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-10SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-03SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-03SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-03SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-03-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-01SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-01HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-03-01HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-02-25HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-22HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-22HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback