AR HB1521 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1521 is now Act 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1521 is now Act 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Counties To Burn Storm Debris Based On County-declared Disaster Emergencies.
Title
To Allow Counties To Burn Storm Debris Based On County-declared Disaster Emergencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Richmond [R] | Sen. Terry Rice [R] | Rep. Brandt Smith [R] | Rep. Grant Hodges [R] |
Rep. Mike Holcomb [R] | Rep. Lane Jean [R] | Rep. Lanny Fite [R] | Sen. John Payton [R] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Notification that HB1521 is now Act 330 |
2017-02-27 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-02-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-02-27 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |