AR HB1520 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Notification that HB1520 is now Act 762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Notification that HB1520 is now Act 762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Code Concerning Occupational Criminal Background Checks; And To Ensure That Licensees Who Were Licensed Prior To The Enactment Of Acts 2019, No. 990, Are Allowed To Maintain Their Licenses.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Code Concerning Occupational Criminal Background Checks; And To Ensure That Licensees Who Were Licensed Prior To The Enactment Of Acts 2019, No. 990, Are Allowed To Maintain Their Licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Notification that HB1520 is now Act 762 |
2021-04-15 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-14 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-31 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-31 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-29 | House | Motion to refer back to committee passed |
2021-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-02-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |