AR HB1518 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Notification that HB1518 is now Act 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Set Minimum Dementia Training Requirements For Staff Members Who Are Employed By An Assisted Living Facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Set Minimum Dementia Training Requirements For Staff Members Who Are Employed By An Assisted Living Facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21HouseNotification that HB1518 is now Act 335
2023-03-17HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-03-16HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-03-16HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-03-16SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2023-03-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-15SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-03-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-03-08SenateReceived from the House.
2023-03-08HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-07HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-03-06HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-02-28HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback