AR HB1518 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that HB1518 is now Act 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that HB1518 is now Act 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Hemp-derived Cannabidiol.
Title
Concerning Hemp-derived Cannabidiol.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Notification that HB1518 is now Act 504 |
2019-03-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |