AR HB1516 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that HB1516 is now Act 836
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Allow A Foundation To Serve As A Fiduciary; And To Provide For A Foundation To Serve As An Executor Of An Estate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Allow A Foundation To Serve As A Fiduciary; And To Provide For A Foundation To Serve As An Executor Of An Estate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseNotification that HB1516 is now Act 836
2019-04-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-04HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-04HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-03HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-04-02HouseRe-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2019-04-02HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-02SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-01SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-25SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-20HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-18HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback