AR HB1516 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning School Nursing; To Establish School Nurse-to-student Ratios; And To Require An Annual School Nurse Survey.
Title
Concerning School Nursing; To Establish School Nurse-to-student Ratios; And To Require An Annual School Nurse Survey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 52 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-03-08 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed |