AR HB1515 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Notification that HB1515 is now Act 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Medicaid Provider-led Organized Care Act; And To Prohibit Ownership Interest In More Than One (1) Risk-based Provider Organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Medicaid Provider-led Organized Care Act; And To Prohibit Ownership Interest In More Than One (1) Risk-based Provider Organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseNotification that HB1515 is now Act 508
2021-03-30HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-03-29HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-03-29HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-03-29SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-03-29SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-10SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-10SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-09HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-22HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-22HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback