AR HB1515 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning On-campus Standards For Accreditation Of Arkansas Public Schools And School Districts Reviews.
Title
Concerning On-campus Standards For Accreditation Of Arkansas Public Schools And School Districts Reviews.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 36 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-09 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed |